Accounts and annual returns CONVENT OF THE RELIGIOUS ORDER OF ST JOSEPH DE CLUNY

Charity Number: 237340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 16 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 16 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 11 March 2015 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 11 March 2015 131 days late
Annual return 31 December 2012 21 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 21 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 19 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 19 June 2012 On Time