LINDFIELD PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and encouraging the preservation and development of the village of Lindfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 January 1965: Standard registration
- Lindfield Society (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY FOR THE PRESERVATION OF LINDFIELD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Geoffrey Heath | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dumbrell | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Comstock | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £4.21k | £4.15k | £3.28k | £3.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £4.97k | £2.41k | £5.15k | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AGREED AT ANNUAL GENERAL MEETING 1962 AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING ON 17TH OCTOBER 1984 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2004 as amended on 15 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE VILLAGE AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. (B) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND TO PREVENT DEVELOPMENT WHICH CONFLICTS THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
LINDFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 High Street
Lindfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 2HL
- Phone:
- 07437191288
- Email:
- jcomstock105@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window