PURVIS ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of investment income for the benefit of the inhabitants of Beccles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Anthony Hickman | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
James Bryan Cook | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAY LOUVAINE BALDRY | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MARK JERMEY | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN MORTON | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES SEPPINGS | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|||||
KEITH GREGORY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES MICHAEL HARTLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENNETH JOHN LEGGETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER IRENE LANGESKOV | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 23RD APRIL 1827 (SEE U.V.22 P. 435) SCHEME DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1926. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF UP TO 4 PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 55 RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BECCLES AND IN FINANCIAL NEED
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BECCLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beccles Townlands Charity
Leman House
Ballygate
BECCLES
NR34 9ND
- Phone:
- 07938842757
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window