THE CLIFTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall is venue for a variety of social events. Maintenance of the Village Hall and School House - which is let to a tennant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 09 November 1964: Standard registration
- CLIFTON VILLAGE HALL & SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Gareth Garnon | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Dykes | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Robert Barker | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Susan BLACKNELL | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Rice | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLARE Catherine ASHTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN RAYMOND HOOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCIS NORMAN BUCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.15k | £24.15k | £26.27k | £29.15k | £28.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.71k | £8.62k | £6.39k | £7.63k | £19.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2020 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 29 DECEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CLIFTON-CUM-GLAPTON AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CLIFTON-CUM-GLAPTON AND THE IMMEDIATED VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Leabrook Close
Clifton Village
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 8NW
- Phone:
- 0115 9140759
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window