CHURCHOVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 237490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Churchover Relief in Need Charity works to help people resident in the Parish of Churchover who are in need, hardship or distress. It also provides small grants to young people of Churchover for educational purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £28,524
Total expenditure: £44,732

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 1971: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 09 August 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID PROCTOR Chair
CHURCHOVER VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
FUTURES UNLOCKED
Received: On time
HOPE 4 (RUGBY) LTD
Received: On time
Sara Wills S L Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Deborah Henson Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Grazyna Teresa Miarkowska Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
GARY BETTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.47k £21.44k £22.66k £24.55k £28.52k
Total expenditure £9.13k £12.44k £11.82k £25.40k £44.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Heath End
School Street
Churchover
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV23 0EG
Phone:
078037569613
Website:

No information available