BRENTFORD BAPTIST TRUST

Charity number: 237594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We supply a house for the minister and make grants to Ealing Road Baptist Church and other strict and particular baptist churches.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,484
Total expenditure: £20,130

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hounslow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BAPTIST CHAPEL, NORTH ROAD, BRENTFORD, - MANSE FOR THE MINISTER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Grace Baptist Trust Corporation Trustee
LEE STREET CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
THE PRESTON SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH EBENEZER OLD BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
EBENEZER CHAPEL
Received: On time
HARROLD AND CARLTON GRACE BAPTIST CHURCH MANSE
Received: On time
THE WILTSHIRE STRICT AND PARTICULAR BAPTIST CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
BROCKHAM BAPTIST TRUST
Received: On time
UNION CHAPEL MANSE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.02k £16.95k £16.65k £20.95k £23.48k
Total expenditure £18.00k £18.00k £21.50k £19.63k £20.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 CROYDON ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 6PA
Phone:
01883 345488
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available