Trustees SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Charity Number: 237616

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Gritzman | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Muslin | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sallyann Hoffman | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Klein | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Elvin | Trustee | 05 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY KINN | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROYSTON | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE LOWEY | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA GOLDSTEIN | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEWIS MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN LEVITAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.