ANNIE BERTHA LLOYD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Look after and maintain six almshouses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 January 1965: Standard registration
- WASHINGTON ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Binney | Chair | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Christine Tuson | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Graham Hutt | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Leslie Keech | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
GLYNN HUGH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE TURLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.84k | £33.64k | £34.26k | £37.81k | £45.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.02k | £9.57k | £3.67k | £54.21k | £49.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28TH AUGUST 1973, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26 JULY 2004 AND RESOLUTION DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
PEOPLE IN NEED WHO ARE RESIDENT AT THE TIME OF APPLICATION, OR WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENT, IN THE PARISH OF WASHINGTON. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WORKERS, ARTISANS AND RETIRED SMALL TRADESMEN OR THEIR WIDOWS, SISTERS OR DAUGHTERS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WASHINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blessings
Barns Farm Lane
Storrington
Pulborough
RH20 4AH
- Phone:
- 07734607464
- Email:
- annieberthalloyd@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window