KIRKLAND AND BLENCARN READING ROOM AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving the local commummity and educational needs of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 11 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Sharp | Chair | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Porter | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David High | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Enright | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hartness | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Porter | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £12.49k | £11.66k | £2.09k | £3.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.93k | £2.15k | £2.30k | £2.99k | £4.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 March 2021 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 11/7/1933
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A READING AND RECREATION ROOM AND VILLAGE INSTITUTE. FOR THE USE OF ALL PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KIRKLAND AND BLENCARN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ardale House
Blencarn
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA10 1TX
- Phone:
- 07984 696418
- Email:
- janeandbobporter@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window