Financial history HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY

Charity number: 237703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.50k £3.50k £3 £7.80k £0
Total expenditure £5.59k £2.41k £2.62k £4.39k £3.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A