THE BUDDENS ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides 6 units of accommodation for elderly people who have previously lived in the area. Should preferably have been in rented accommodation and have little in the way of assets. Low rent compared with market.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Michael Boulton | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Owen Selby | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Arthur Oakley | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamasine Elise Whitbread | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Miles Love | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Love | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.30k | £9.25k | £9.66k | £9.02k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.65k | £5.81k | £6.56k | £30.31k | £23.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 August 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILLS PROVED 4TH DECEMBER 1924, 21ST JANUARY 1932 AND SCHEME DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1955.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED OR INFIRM PEOPLE, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO MARRIED COUPLES.
Area of benefit
CHRISTCHURCH (AS IN 1924)
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Mudeford
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 4AS
- Phone:
- 01202 480857
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window