CHARITY OF REVEREND WALTER LEVETT (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE LICH GATE CHARITY)

Charity number: 237735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance and Management of a listed almshouse

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,352
Total expenditure: £3,838

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRAY LICH GATE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd Canon Ainsley Laird Swift Trustee 06 April 2018
WILLIAM CHERRY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRAY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL CHARITY OF PENYSTON AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF REVEREND ROBERT CHALLONER FOR SERMONS
Received: On time
THE BERKS CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
KEITH TRAVELL Trustee 06 April 2018
None on record
MARGARET ELIZABETH PIERCE Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER STANLEY BOWLER LL B Trustee
None on record
Peter James Sands Trustee
LOUIS BAYLIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
LOUIS BAYLIS (MAIDENHEAD ADVERTISER) CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Graham Eric Barker MStJ DL Trustee
THE ROYAL NATIONAL THEATRE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
The Inside Out Trust
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.22k £16.04k £14.06k £16.77k £20.35k
Total expenditure £3.22k £13.01k £22.88k £10.12k £3.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 March 2024 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 High Street
Bray
Maidenhead
SL6 2AA
Phone:
01628622289
Website:

No information available