THE DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE CHARITY (SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK)

Charity Number: 237760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The care of the poor sick and elderly and involvement in the life of the Parish and local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £66,649
Total expenditure: £59,029

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SACRED HEART CONVENT SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister ANNA YEO CHAI LUAN Trustee 02 September 2023
ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL
Received: On time
SISTER JACINTA Trustee
ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL
Received: On time
SISTER THOMAS MORE Trustee
ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL
Received: On time
SISTER FRANCIS Trustee
ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £752.36k £173.93k £92.80k £77.84k £66.65k
Total expenditure £1.19m £118.00k £37.97k £84.83k £59.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £47.46k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £701.31k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 Sandringham Road
HUNSTANTON
Norfolk
PE36 5DP
Phone:
01485532837
Website:

No information available