EMERY AND OWEN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides relief to Parishoners within the civil Parish of Crowmarsh by grants to relieve hardship or by providing grant to aid a support group to the Parish. Also provides allottment space for the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 November 1964: Standard registration
- CHARITY OF MARY AND SARAH OWEN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANDREW CLIFTON JOHNSON | Chair | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hill | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jim McGill | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
REVD KEVIN BEER | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN PRATT | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR John Bromley | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/10/2019 | 10/10/2020 | 10/10/2021 | 10/10/2022 | 10/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £2.71k | £2.57k | £6.32k | £4.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.04k | £3.24k | £4.83k | £4.28k | £3.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 October 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2019 | 14 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SEVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISHES OF CROWMARSH GIFFORD AND NEWNHAM MURREN
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Thames Mead
Crowmarsh Gifford
Wallingford
OX10 8EU
- Phone:
- 07802 438883
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window