Accounts and annual returns ANNE DAWSON'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 237792
Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Annual return 13 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 438 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 438 days
Annual return 13 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Annual return 13 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Annual return 13 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days