THE ABBEYFIELD SHANKLIN SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sheltered accommodation for the elderly including main meals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 17 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ryan | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clark | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.11k | £199.55k | £219.78k | £243.79k | £251.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.09k | £221.43k | £220.52k | £225.13k | £274.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.42k | £8.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 July 2024 | 335 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 July 2024 | 335 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 8TH OCTOBER 1963, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 07/04/2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FORTH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
SHANKLIN AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbeyfield (Shanklin) Society Ltd
14 Queens Road
SHANKLIN
PO37 6AN
- Phone:
- 01983862937
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window