REHEARSAL ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since its foundation in 1957, the Rehearsal Orchestra has promoted an annual residential orchestral course during the Edinburgh Festival, and arranged weekend courses in London and other parts of the UK aimed at providing an orchestral training resource for talented players and soloists of all ages and from all parts of the UK and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 February 1968: Standard registration
- 06 August 2018: Funds received from 252451 THE BIRD CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH RANTZEN | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Stewart McIlwham | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Napier Sturt | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain James Hasnip | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Adeline Marjory Sarah Balfour | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Ronaldson McMillan | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Alexander Kershaw | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.56k | £26.89k | £28.15k | £70.35k | £172.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.00k | £34.52k | £25.25k | £74.51k | £80.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 1964 AS AMENDED 20 NOVEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF MANKIND IN THE ART OF MUSIC AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO TO PROMOTE AMONG PEOPLE THE STUDY, PLAYING AND COMPOSING OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4-6 Church Road
Burgess Hill
West Sussex
RH15 9AE
- Phone:
- 07483924338
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window