Financial history ST ANDREW'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH UPPER HANOVER STREET SHEFFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 237839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £57.43k £119.45k £67.94k £76.07k £69.73k
Total expenditure £89.88k £93.24k £121.83k £114.66k £115.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A