DANSKE KIRKE I LONDON (DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to take care of the social, cultural and religious needs of the Danish community in London. The charity achieves these objectives by maintaining and supporting the buildings and fabric of the Danish Church in London and by providing events and bursaries to the Danish community in London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elisabeth Petersen Broyd | Chair | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Sofie Lucan | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Svend Kjaer | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ebba Nielsen | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ole Justesen | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connie Yilmaz Jantzen | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Dorothea Bruun Aubry | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Niels Ring Andersen | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kaare Casper Orlyk | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Flemming Kloster Poulsen | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Grethe Jensen | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PER GULLESTRUP | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PALLE BAGGESGAARD PEDERSEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91m | £860.28k | £487.88k | £1.03m | £348.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £839.20k | £2.14m | £793.57k | £355.67k | £331.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.76m | £758.98k | N/A | £104.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.37k | £37.07k | N/A | £15.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £77.98k | £19.84k | N/A | £161.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £9.92k | N/A | £1 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £51.30k | £44.40k | N/A | £44.99k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £704.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £796.61k | £2.11m | N/A | £279.36k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £42.58k | £25.31k | N/A | £76.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.81k | £6.66k | N/A | £5.06k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1957, 29 APRIL 1962, 7 APRIL 1977, 30 JANUARY 1994 AND 11 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PREACH THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL INCLUDING ARRANGING SERMONS AND CONDUCTING THE CHURCH'S CEREMONIES FOR DANISH IN THE LONDON AREA
Area of benefit
LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Linked charities
- 02 February 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Danish Church
4 St. Katharines Precinct
LONDON
NW1 4HH
- Phone:
- 020 7935 7584
- Email:
- kirke@danskekirke.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window