Governing document DANSKE KIRKE I LONDON (DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON)
Charity number: 237897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1957, 29 APRIL 1962, 7 APRIL 1977, 30 JANUARY 1994 AND 11 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PREACH THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL INCLUDING ARRANGING SERMONS AND CONDUCTING THE CHURCH'S CEREMONIES FOR DANISH IN THE LONDON AREA
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.