Trustees DANSKE KIRKE I LONDON (DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON)
Charity number: 237897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elisabeth Petersen Broyd | Chair | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Sofie Lucan | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Svend Kjaer | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ebba Nielsen | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ole Justesen | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connie Yilmaz Jantzen | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Dorothea Bruun Aubry | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Niels Ring Andersen | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kaare Casper Orlyk | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Flemming Kloster Poulsen | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Grethe Jensen | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PER GULLESTRUP | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PALLE BAGGESGAARD PEDERSEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.