EYE WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity Number: 237929
Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of Poverty Accommodation/Housing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011

Total income: £7
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV ANDREW MARK MITCHAM Chair
None on record
ANDREW STREVENS EVITT Trustee
None on record
BERNARD ALFRED TATUM Trustee
None on record
ALAN WILLIAM COOPER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £2.40k £1.08k £9 £7 £7
Total expenditure £1.67k £1.69k £1.25k £82 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 13 FEBRUARY 1974
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF EYE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF EYE
Registration history
  • 20 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH STREET
EYE
SUFFOLK
IP23 7AW
Phone:
01379870277
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available