FRANCIS BARKER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 237939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

One and a half per cent of the income is given to Beckingham Parochial Church Council, Nottinghamshire. The balance of the income is for the benefit of the Parishes of Gainsborugh, Lea and Morton, Lincolnshire to assist persons in need and to contribut to and support charitable associations, institutions or trusts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £1,062
Total expenditure: £1,330

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GAINSBOROUGH PAROCHIAL CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darren Lee Topp Trustee 13 November 2023
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Matthew David Boles Trustee 08 November 2021
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Wendy Carrick Trustee 09 March 2020
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
Rev Canon STEPHEN WILLIAM JOHNSON Trustee 11 November 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEAM GAINSBOROUGH & MORTON
Received: 28 days late
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
TYLER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
JESSIE MILNE Trustee 19 May 2014
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES COOPER FOR ALMSHOUSES INCLUDING AUGMENTATIONS OF JOHN EVERITT COOPER
Received: On time
ALISTAIR ROBIN HEPPENSTALL Trustee
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
SUSAN MARGARET RITCHIE B ED Trustee
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEAM GAINSBOROUGH & MORTON
Received: 28 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £969 £981 £1.47k £1.06k
Total expenditure £488 £415 £565 £404 £1.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 17 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 MARKET PLACE
GAINSBOROUGH
LINCOLNSHIRE
DN21 2BZ
Phone:
07961711333
Website:

No information available