SAWBRIDGEWORTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 237946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sawbridgeworth Trust helps those in need, especially the elderly. It also helps in educational visits. We as trustees are very mindful of people not being able to replace general household appliances. Childrens clothing has been another area of need, especially School Uniforms. The Charity also makes an grant at Christmas to all those within their area to help with extra finances at this parti

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,140
Total expenditure: £17,076

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE SAWBRIDGEWORTH TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dian Sapsford Miss Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Bagnall Miss Trustee 16 July 2021
None on record
Nicolas Heslop Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
ANGELA ALDER Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Ruth Buckmaster Trustee 09 July 2015
FAWBERT AND BARNARD'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HAZEL BEAVIS Trustee 26 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.00k £14.00k £18.24k £16.14k £16.14k
Total expenditure £14.00k £11.80k £8.31k £17.03k £17.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 August 2024 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 January 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 1ST JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Registration history
  • 17 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
11 THE FOREBURY
SAWBRIDGEWORTH
CM21 9BD
Phone:
01279723212
Website:

No information available