LADY NOEL BYRON'S NURSING CHARITY (EAST AND WEST HORSLEY BRANCH)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting individuals with medical needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 November 1964: Standard registration
- 21 August 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 21 August 2015: Funds transferred to 1111600 COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR SURREY
- THE LADY NOEL BYRON NURSING ASSOCIATION FOR EAST AND WEST HORSLEY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £2.14k | £2.13k | £1.66k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £2.07k | £2.09k | £1.72k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 18 March 2015 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 15 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 12 February 2013 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/03/1903 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/08/1907 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/08/1920 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/05/1954 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/08/2015
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF SICK POOR IN THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST HORSLEY.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window