Accounts and annual returns THE ABBEYFIELD COVENTRY SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity Number: 237988
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 21 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 25 October 2005 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 20 April 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window