LADY CHARLES BRUCE'S TOOTING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bruce Trust is a sub committee of the Parochial Church Council of the Parish Church of All Saints Tooting. The Bruce Trust maintains and runs the operations of the Parish Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 19 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mae Elizabeth Mouk | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neville Burton | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan White | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Kaufeler | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.20k | £15.66k | £23.02k | £27.60k | £33.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.93k | £25.36k | £26.89k | £29.74k | £30.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 March 2022 | 501 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHANCERY COVER SCHEME DATED 11TH JUNE 1909, SCHEME OF 16TH FEBRUARY 1954 AND 27TH JULY 1981
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND INSURANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND OF ANY CHURCH HALL THEREOF AND SUBJECT THERETO IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, TOOTING.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, TOOTING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bruce Trust
Vicarage
84 Franciscan Road
London
SW17 8DQ
- Phone:
- 02087677705
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window