WEAVERS' COMPANY TEXTILE EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund provides scholarships to textile weaving students and grants to help educational establishments deliver the necessary training properly to equip them for work in the modern textile industry. It also makes awards to honour and encourage the achievements of workers at all levels of occupation within the industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 January 1965: Standard registration
- 28 February 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 February 2014: Funds transferred to 266189 THE WEAVERS' COMPANY BENEVOLENT FUND
- THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WEAVERS GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.53k | £94.41k | £94.89k | £134.50k | £145.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.76k | £110.40k | £123.10k | £131.21k | £146.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 02 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 02 July 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 04 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 09 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 13 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 22 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1933, MINUTE OF MEETING HELD ON 20 MARCH 1973, SCHEMES DATED 14 DECEMBER 1993, AND 28 FEBRUARY 2002 AND RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 282 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF LEEDS OR FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE WEAVERS' COMPANY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window