THE POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 238098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist Elderly/Old People and other defined groups and makes grants to individuals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £32,996
Total expenditure: £11,420

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL CLARENCE MARSHALL Chair
FREISTON PLAYING FIELD CHARITY
Received: On time
Bridgett Posey Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Professor Simon Pearson Trustee 20 September 2012
THE JOURNAL OF HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY
Received: On time
THE DOUGLAS BOMFORD TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Higginson Trustee
CHARITY OF SIMON CLARKE
Received: On time
PINCHBECK'S SCHOOL, BUTTERWICK
Received: On time
THE POORS LAND CHARITY (EXCLUDING POORS LAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
ROY PEARSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.18k £11.82k £12.08k £12.41k £33.00k
Total expenditure £11.62k £9.62k £10.65k £9.84k £11.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 OCTOBER 1953 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE C.C. DATED 8TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF FREISTON
Registration history
  • 11 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Mamora House
Church Rd
Freiston
Boston
Lincs
PE22 0NX
Phone:
07947 581264
Website:

No information available