Trustees THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 238107

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Rosie Davy | Chair | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Parsons | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Linda Davy | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Paul Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||
carol wood | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Cllr Marie Bradburn | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|||||
June Bryant | Trustee | 20 March 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.