THE WYLIE TRUST

Charity number: 238109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Small grants to residents of the Milton Keynes parishes of Bradwell, New Bradwell, Stantonbury and the area of Bradwell Abbey who are aged 70 years or over at or around Christmas time.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £104
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 December 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cllr Rosie Davy Chair 16 November 2017
None on record
Elaine Parsons Trustee 27 October 2022
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND JAMES HUME
Received: On time
Linda Davy Trustee 22 November 2021
WOLVERTON GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
carol wood Trustee 16 November 2017
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND JAMES HUME
Received: On time
Rev Paul Smith Trustee 16 November 2017
NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND JAMES HUME
Received: On time
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
June Bryant Trustee 20 May 2016
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND JAMES HUME
Received: On time
Cllr Marie Bradburn Trustee 20 May 2016
THE BRADWELL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND JAMES HUME
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/09/2019 23/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £96 £98 £125 £104 £104
Total expenditure £0 £200 £100 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 23 September 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 September 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 Glovers Lane
Heelands
Milton Keynes
MK13 7LW
Phone:
01908221465
Website:

n.a