Financial history AGNES DIXON CHARITY

Charity number: 238126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.30k £5.80k £7.03k £7.25k £5.22k
Total expenditure £9.52k £11.18k £3.13k £1.23k £2.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A