Trustees BACON GRAY CHARITY
Charity number: 238150

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Owen | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Ella Susan Fisk | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Robin Wyn Williams | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Kevin Moran | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Geraint Bebb | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||
SONIA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||
ERYL MAIR LEWIS BA | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||
William Thomson Love | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||
SELWYN TREFOR WILLAIMS | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID MICHAEL DAVIES | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|||||||||
COLIN REGINALD DAVEY BA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.