THE LIVESEY SOUTH METROPOLITAN AND SOUTH SUBURBAN BEQUESTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 December 1964: Standard registration
- 25 September 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AS VARIED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEMES OF 10TH DECEMBER 1987 AND 31 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION TO MEET EXCEPTIONAL CASES OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE FOLLOWING PERSONS NAMELY:- PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED BY THE SUBURBAN GAS COMPANY AND THEIR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS, PERSONS EMPLOYED OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED BY THE SAID BOARD, MAINLY, WITHIN THE DISTRICT FORMERLY SERVED BY THE SOUTH SUBURBAN GAS COMPANY AND THEIR WIDOWS, AND PERSONS WHO WERE FORMERLY EMPLOYED BYT THE FORMER BOARD AND PERSONS EMPLOYED OR FOFMERLY EMPLOYED BY THE SAID CORPORATION. (SEE SCHEME OF FULL DETAILS.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window