THORNBURY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust owns almshouses in the form of four flats in Thornbury and makes grants in to those in need in the parish. This trust also owns a commercial property on Thornbury High Street, and allotments with over 140 plots. The rental income of the commercial property and allotments helps to finance the Almshouses and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 December 1964: Standard registration
- THORNBURY TOWN TRUST (Working name)
- CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian John Dibble | Trustee | 16 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margo Lillibeth Deas | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Anne Belbin | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Catherine Symonds | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Davies | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Paul Pearce | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MICHAEL MORRISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.15k | £54.88k | £46.11k | £58.37k | £60.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.63k | £48.28k | £58.16k | £48.64k | £61.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR AGED WIDOWERS, WIDOWS OR OTHER SINGLE PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF THORNBURY AND THE PROVISION OF BENEFITS FOR SUCH RESIDENTS. 2. RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF THORNBURY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
THORNBURY
Linked charities
- 29 December 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornbury Town Trust
c/o Town Hall
35 High Street
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 2AR
- Phone:
- 07835 110766
- Email:
- sallytowntrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thornburytowntrust.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window