CHARITY OF MRS ELIZABETH COOK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of some -ú19 a year goes into the funds of the Parochial Church Council of Holy Trinity in Cambridge. It is spent on maintaining the fabric of the church building, as long as the PCC of St Andrew the Great do not request funds to maintain the graves of the Cook family in their church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 22 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 8TH APRIL 1833 (P.R. 31 P. 45).
Charitable objects
AFTER KEEPING CLEAN AND UNDEFACED THE MONUMENT AND INSCRIPTION TO HER HUSBAND CAPTAIN COOK, THE FAMOUS NAVIGATOR, AND THE STONE IN THE CENTRAL AISLE OF THE CHURCH AND AFTER PAYING $2 10S. ANNUALLY TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING THE RESIDUE TO BE DIVIDED BETWEEN FIVE POOR AGED WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE ST. ANDREW THE GREAT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window