TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH EARL SHILTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity Number: 238383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Earl Shilton United Reform Church is a place of Worship.We hold the usual sort of activites a church do to raise money to keep our Church going.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,841
Total expenditure: £18,287

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EARL SHILTON CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH (TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION THEREWITH) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Coe Trustee 02 March 2019
None on record
KATHLEEN RIDGEWAY Trustee
None on record
VALERIE ANN ROWLEY Trustee
None on record
PAULA JEYNES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.06k £7.28k £7.59k £7.75k £5.84k
Total expenditure £20.45k £9.40k £11.53k £12.41k £18.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHURCH MINUTES OF 30 SEPTEMBER 1924 AND RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1971.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SICK AND AGED OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF EARL SHILTON
Registration history
  • 21 February 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
55 CHARNWOOD ROAD
BARWELL
LEICESTER
LE9 8FL
Phone:
01455444672
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available