CHARITY OF JAMES BENTLEY FOR POOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE MONEY FOR THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 March 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Palmer | Chair | 13 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Victoria Clarke | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Angela Corlett | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.39k | £533 | £5.26k | £5.45k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £852 | £152 | £510 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2024 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT LONDON 7TH DECEMBER 1880 (U.V.51 P.164). AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER CHARITIES ACT 1993 SECTION 74(2)(C)
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF IN MONEY OR KIND OF ANY PERSONS WHO ARE CONSIDERED TO BE EXPERIENCING HARDSHIP AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF CHESHUNT OR WALTHAM CROSS OR GOFFS OAK.
Area of benefit
CHESHUNT, WALTHAM CROSS AND GOFFS OAK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church House
51 Churchgate
Cheshunt
WALTHAM CROSS
EN8 9NB
- Phone:
- 01992635190
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window