HAMPSTEAD NORREYS WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 238452
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall provides meeting rooms for the use of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- West Berkshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 11 January 1965: Standard registration
- 03 January 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- HAMPSTEAD NORREYS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- HAMPSTEAD NORRIS WAR MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £13.58k | £5.03k | £288 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.07k | £12.39k | £14.55k | £7.29k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 5TH MAY 1975
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HAMPSTEAD NORREYS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window