ASTLEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
People in need have been identified as those who are housebound, in the Parish of Astley, but who wish to stay in their homes. Help is given in the form of transport to services that they need to access. A small amount of funding is available to support shemes which enhance the locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 23 September 1971: Standard registration
- 10 January 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1159747 NUNEATON FOODBANK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98 | £340 | £102 | £208 | £80 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ASTLEY EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASTLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window