Financial history PUBLIC HALL (THE CORDES HALL)

Charity number: 238678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £27.67k £21.18k £26.77k £30.10k £198.07k
Total expenditure £23.71k £23.12k £31.23k £29.72k £96.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.19k £4.67k N/A £68.20k