PUBLIC HALL (THE CORDES HALL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of a hall for public use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £68,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 04 February 1965: Standard registration
- Save The Novello Picture House (Working name)
- THE CORDES HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Cummings | Chair | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Mear | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA ROBINSON | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.67k | £21.18k | £26.77k | £30.10k | £198.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.71k | £23.12k | £31.23k | £29.72k | £96.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.19k | £4.67k | N/A | £68.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 24TH JUNE 1901 (U.V.136 PAGE 394)
Charitable objects
TO BE USED BY THE VICAR FOR PROMOTING THE SPIRITUAL MORAL OR SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE INDENTURE).
Area of benefit
SUNNINGHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MANSFIELD CLOSE
ASCOT
Berkshire
SL5 8NW
- Phone:
- 07778 742203
- Email:
- vcatcordeshall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window