FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Kensington Church, open to everyone, provides for the community weekly Sunday Church Services, a Sunday School, Wednesday Testimony Meetings, a Christian Science Reading Room bookshop and sponsors regular free lectures. All details are on our church website www.firstlondon.org, with world-wide links to daily articles, podcasts and videos about Christian science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 08 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Collison | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Harragin | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bradshaw | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY BRADSHAW | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN LUKE | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328.59k | £373.74k | £503.94k | £238.04k | £309.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £462.96k | £328.49k | £357.56k | £199.87k | £297.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £259.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.31k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £242.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £243.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £318.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £38.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £34.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £38.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 August 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 August 2021 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES FCCS, 23RD SEPTEMBER 1974 AS AMENDED JUNE 1997, SEPTEMBER 1998 & 20TH SEPTEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO SPREAD THE UNDERSTANDING OF TRUTH AS SET FORTH IN THE BIBLE AND INTERPRETED IN SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES BY MARY BAKER EDDY, THE DISCOVERER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST LO
8 WRIGHTS LANE
LONDON
W8 6TA
- Phone:
- 02079373389
- Email:
- clerk@firstlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window