DORSET DOWN SHEEP BREEDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourage the breeding of Dorset Down Sheep and maintain the purity of the breed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alun Wyn Evans | Chair | 27 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mason Bailey Worsfold-Gregg | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Claire Lewis | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Hyde | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Louise Brice | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robert VELLACOTT | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER CHARLES GIBBS | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HENRY BURROUGH | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Rachel HEXT | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELSPETH WILKINS | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS WILLIAM KENNETH OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JANE MCMINN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES DAVID RANDOLPH TORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BENN LUGSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JAMES BOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT GEOFFREY HYDE | Trustee |
|
||||||
TIMOTHY ANDREW WARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD HOLLOWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN HEBDITCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE SUSAN ROWBERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.65k | £10.55k | £13.41k | £10.90k | £10.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.26k | £6.97k | £7.69k | £9.02k | £9.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 1ST JUNE 1905
Charitable objects
ENCOURAGMENT OF THE BREEDING OF DORSET DOWN SHEEP AT HOME AND ABROAD, AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAVETT FARM
HAVETT ROAD
DOBWALLS
LISKEARD
PL14 6HB
- Phone:
- 01579320273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window