Accounts and annual returns BROOMFIELD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 238790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 10 February 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 13 March 2022 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 27 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required