SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT MENCAP AND GATEWAY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the club is the relief of people with a learning disability by providing help and support for them and their families, dependents and carers, and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation of other leisure time occupation for people who have need thereof by reason of learning disability with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 January 1965: Standard registration
- SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Clamp | Chair | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Clamp | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kirkland | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.23k | £4.47k | £1.46k | £6.97k | £11.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.11k | £6.05k | £3.20k | £6.40k | £12.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 5TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Winchester Drive
Linton
SWADLINCOTE
Derbyshire
DE12 6PW
- Phone:
- 07872919394
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window