THE ABBEYFIELD TORBAY SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Abbeyfield Torbay Society Ltd ceased to trade in October 2007, the only remaining action was the sale of the property which has eventually taken place Feb 2011. Following the resignation of two Trustees, the demise of a third, the remaining Trustee in May 2011 wished to resign so he requested that governing body, the Abbeyfied Society take over to wind up the Company. Still awaiting completion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 09 December 1964: Standard registration
- 03 April 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.93k | £62.13k | £54.87k | £600 | £318 | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.38k | £45.10k | £47.00k | £10.37k | £7.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6THE DECEMBER 1963.
Charitable objects
TO HOUSE LONELY OLD PEOPLE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE ON THEIR OWN, AND IN SO DOING TO PROVIDE A FOCAL POINT FOR THE GOODWILL AND KINDNESS OF NEIGHBOURS.
Area of benefit
TORBAY AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window