COLLIER AND GOOSE HAM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity for the relief of poverty within the Diocese of the Witney Parish of Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 January 1965: Standard registration
- WITNEY ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY (Working name)
- THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Susannah Hester Jones | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr PAUL WATSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
JEAN MARION GREENWAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
REVD SARAH CHARLOTTE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.75k | £11.44k | £12.04k | £12.21k | £12.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.94k | £8.73k | £4.85k | £8.41k | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY POOR PERSONS, BEING MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WITNEY, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS .
Area of benefit
TOWN OF WITNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Schofield Gardens
WITNEY
OX28 1JY
- Phone:
- 07768305000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window