Financial history TOWN LANDS CHARITY

Charity Number: 238950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.61k £1.61k £1.61k £1.61k £1.61k
Total expenditure £1.84k £1.22k £1.22k £1.28k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A