TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CAPEL COFFA CONGREGATION CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 10 November 1965: Standard registration
- TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CAPEL COFFA CONGREGATION CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eirwen Edwards | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mair Heledd Cressey | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALWYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VINCENT LLOYD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYNETH MARY TRINDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROL ANN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ELISABETH BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.92k | £28.64k | £27.75k | £24.62k | £25.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.36k | £19.98k | £27.26k | £34.46k | £41.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 10 November 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 Deganwy Road
Llanrhos
Llandudno
LL30 1NA
- Phone:
- 01492583433
- Email:
- jean@barlowstalyfan.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window